Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Miller, Hartman, Cox, Arikan, Reilly, and Corderman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an applicant who is a law enforcement officer with a law enforcement agency in Delaware, Pennsylvania, Virginia, West Virginia, or Washington, D.C. from the firearms safety training course requirement for a handgun qualification license.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0327
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/22/2019
Legislative Date
8/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/22/2019 8/22/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 8:45 AM