Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Aquaculture Coordinating Council to include one representative of the Oyster Recovery Partnership and one representative of the Maryland Farm Bureau.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0051
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/30/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/30/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 4/01/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-03.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM