Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Use of State Residents and Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a State procurement unit to adopt regulations concerning the use of State residents and businesses for specified procurement contracts; requiring that the regulations require a unit to make a determination before awarding each procurement contract concerning resident bidders or resident offerors; requiring that the regulations encourage a nonresident bidder or nonresident offeror that is awarded a procurement contract to employ State residents and use State businesses in the performance of the procurement contract; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM