Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals convicted of vulnerable-adult abuse to register with a specified supervising authority by a specified time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a specified term; requiring a specified registration to include a digital image that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a specified registry and to provide specified information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0354
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/18/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM