Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each manager and supervisor in the Legislative and Executive branches of State government to immediately report to the appointing authority or head of the principal unit certain incidents of workplace bullying; providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly to educate all employees about bullying, ensure that bullying is not tolerated, and deal appropriately with bullying in the workplace; requiring certain human resources departments to collect and share data on complaints and reports; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-901 through 2-909 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM