Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel and Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified professional counselor or therapist from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a person who is receiving counseling from the professional counselor or therapist or received counseling from the professional counselor or therapist within a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462511/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {732419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {462511/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {732419/1 Adopted 42
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM