Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with specified entities, to adopt regulations defining and governing the use of commercial finfish trotlines; establishing an exception to the prohibition against using more than two hooks or sets of hooks for each commercial rod or line by authorizing a tidal fish licensee to use a finfish trotline; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220012/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {220012/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-221, 4-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM