Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing from 9% to 6% the rate of the sales and use tax applied to certain sales of alcoholic beverages.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2017
Legislative Date
11/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Reduction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2017 11/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Reduction
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM