Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsored by
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court, except under specified circumstances or unless good cause for the award of custody or visitation is shown, from awarding custody of a child or visitation with a child to a parent who has been found guilty of sexual abuse of a minor; clarifying that specified provisions of law may not be construed to require a conviction of a party for a crime before a determination by the court regarding custody or visitation under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0444
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/05/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/05/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM