Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from being considered to be practicing dentistry or violating certain provisions of law based solely on whether the person provides certain services or engages in certain acts; providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit a dentist or a dental practice from contracting to receive certain services or benefiting from certain acts; providing penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry of a fine not to exceed $3,000 per day or imprisonment not exceeding 18 months; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1256
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1584 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2017
Legislative Date
11/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2017 11/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-301, 4-601, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM