Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington, Ebersole, Hixson, and Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and nonpublic schools, defined as noncollegiate educational institutions that hold certificates of approval from the State Board and participate in the Nonpublic Schools Textbook and Technology Grants Program, to develop and implement a program of age-appropriate education relating to the awareness and prevention of sexual abuse and assault; requiring the program to be taught by a teacher trained to provide instruction on the awareness and prevention of sexual abuse and assault; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0383 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2016 1/14/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM