Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Barkley, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a school bus used to transport public school students from any toll, fee, or other charge for the use of the Intercounty Connector.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2016 1/14/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101 )
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 4-312, 4-321 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM