Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education Award
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for education awards from the Segal AmeriCorps Education Award program; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0050
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0790 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM