Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gutierrez, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sanchez, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the parents of a child with a completed individualized education program or a completed individualized family service plan to request the document to be translated into the parents' native language if that language is spoken by more than 1 percent of the student population in the local school system; requiring appropriate school personnel to provide a parent with a translated document within 30 days after the date of the request; and requiring the Department of Education and county boards of education to submit specified reports.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0421
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0044 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {894230/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM