Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law related to the calculation of a certain budget increase for the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; and altering the information that the Authority must submit to the Department of Transportation as part of its yearly performance and condition assessments and reports to include certain single audit reports issued in accordance with certain requirements.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0136
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1412 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {864966/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 35
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 38
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 38A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/20/2020 2:22 PM