Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from operating an automated motor vehicle in automated mode on a highway; establishing an exception to the prohibition by authorizing an individual to operate an automated motor vehicle in automated mode on a highway if the vehicle is properly titled and registered, the individual is in the driver's seat, and the individual has the ability, if necessary, to take control of the vehicle's movements; providing for the registration classification and fee of $50.50 annually for an automated motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-103.3, 11-135, 13-101.1, 13-402, 13-939.3, 21-1130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM