Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Price Clarity Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information about a certain measurement of certain gasoline that must be stated on a sign on the premises of a retail service station dealer to require that the highest price, or the cash price and the credit price, be stated in a clear and visible manner; authorizing a certain sign to state the highest price for a certain measurement of certain other motor fuel products; and repealing a certain exemption from a certain signage requirement for certain retail service station dealers.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0220
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1285 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gas Price Clarity Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Gas Price Clarity Act
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 4:15 PM