Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Glenn, Hammen, Hill, Lam, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified dentists, podiatrists, nurse midwives, and nurse practitioners, in addition to physicians, to issue written certifications to qualifying patients by substituting the defined term "certifying provider" for "certifying physician" as it relates to laws governing medical cannabis; establishing that specified providers must be in good standing with the regulatory board regulating the licensing and certification of specified providers; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {286680/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-21)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted (35-11)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {443028/1 Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {286680/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (110-21) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Finance 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance 35
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted (35-11) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {443028/1 Rejected (17-29) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301, 13-3304, 13-3305, 13-3313, 13-3314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM