Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Bridges, Brooks, Cain, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wells, K. Young, and Cardin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State an expanded polystyrene food service product on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting food service businesses or schools from selling or providing food or beverages in expanded polystyrene food service products on or after July 1, 2020; confirming the authority of local government entities to establish standards that are at least as stringent as those in the Act; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a public education and outreach antilittering campaign; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0285
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0538 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120017/2 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/08 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {223927/1 (Delegate Corderman) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {843021/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-95)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {713727/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (42-93)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {333424/2 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (45-88)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {103020/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-90)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {133022/2 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-26)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {903029/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-25)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {120017/2 Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/08 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 42
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {223927/1 (Delegate Corderman) Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {843021/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-95) 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {713727/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (42-93) 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {333424/2 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (45-88) 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {103020/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-90) 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {274635/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Floor Amendment {133022/2 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-26) 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Floor Amendment {903029/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-25) 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text - Chapter - Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2201 through 9-2207 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:38 PM