Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Sales of Dogs and Cats - Required Health Certificate
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Barkley, Frick, Impallaria, Kramer, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified person who sells a dog or cat to provide the purchaser with a health certificate issued by a veterinarian not more than 30 days before the date of sale; requiring a person who sells a dog or cat to disclose specified health information about the dog or cat to a purchaser; establishing a penalty of a fine not to exceed $1,000 for a violation of the Act; providing that a person may bring a specified action for damages under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0403 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-901 through 19-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM