Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Sydnor, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local correctional facilities to conduct an assessment of the mental health and substance use status of each inmate using evidence-based screenings and assessments to determine if a certain diagnosis is appropriate and if medication-assisted treatment for opioid addiction is appropriate; requiring each local correctional facility to make available at least one formulation of each FDA-approved full opioid agonist, partial opioid agonist, and long-acting opioid antagonist used for the treatment of opioid use disorders; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0846
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {812711/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {217672/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-3) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-603, 9-603.1 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM