Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein (Chair, Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Areas)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor of Ocean City to appoint a designee of the Mayor as a member of the Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays; and establishing that a member from the Atlantic Coastal Bays Watershed who is the Mayor of Ocean City or the designee of the Mayor is not subject to the advice and consent of the Senate.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0132
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {920514/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1803, 8-1804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM