Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving the acquisition of certain real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 unless the Board has provided the Legislative Policy Committee with certain information; prohibiting the Board from approving the acquisition of real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 from the federal government until the Board provides a certain notice and, on a certain request, a study assessing the ongoing fiscal impact the acquisition would have on the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0148
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756584/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814833/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {756584/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {814833/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/30/2020 4:25 PM