Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Moon, Kramer, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a contract or a proposed contract for the sale or lease of consumer goods or services from including a provision waiving the consumer's right to make a specified statement; prohibiting a person from threatening or seeking enforcement of a specified contract provision; prohibiting a person from penalizing a consumer for making a specified statement; providing that the Act does not limit a person from including in a specified contract a provision prohibiting a consumer from making specified disclosures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1325 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM