Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Charles County to alter the school construction excise tax base rates on specified types of dwellings in specified fiscal years in a specified manner; and providing that the school construction excise tax rates may not increase in specified fiscal years by more than the percentage change in the average statewide school building cost as calculated by the Interagency Committee on School Construction.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM