Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Branch, Bromwell, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the tobacco tax rate on premium cigars from 15% to 7.5%; and providing for the termination of the Act after 5 years.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0320
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/20/2016 Text - First - Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM