Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Health and Safety - Emotional Health Awareness Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Dumais, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Kramer, Moon, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified local school systems to implement a specified program of emotional health awareness for specified individuals and to implement a specified program to provide specified student athletes and coaches with specified tools; authorizing specified local school systems to use specified materials and collaborate with organizations with expertise in emotional health or transforming the culture of youth sports; and requiring the State Department of Education to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM