Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM