Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - Bar
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Carter, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, Ivey, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Parrott, Smigiel, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Third Reading Failed (46-89)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a prosecution under a State criminal statute is barred if the defendant was previously prosecuted in a United States District Court for a crime arising out of the same incident, the elements of the crime are identical in the State and federal statutes, and the federal prosecution resulted in a conviction or an acquittal; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {962210/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {612114/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Failed (46-89)
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {962210/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {612114/1 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Failed (46-89) 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM