Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Elliott, Frank, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on theft of a wheeled cart.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {852016/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {852016/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM