Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Boteler, Buckel, Feldmark, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, C. Watson, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
Text - Third - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM