Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund to be the Advantage Maryland Fund Authority and the Advantage Maryland Fund; repealing from the scope of the Authority and the Fund grants to local economic development funds; repealing from the scope of the Authority and the Fund loans to child care facilities to improve child care services; altering the scope of financial assistance provided under the Fund; establishing a specified reporting requirement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-301, 5-302, 5-305, 5-310, 5-311, 5-313, 5-314, 5-315, 5-316, 5-319 through 5-323, 5-324, 5-325, 5-329 through 5-332, 5-335, 5-338, 5-342 through 5-349 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page