Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a Combined Heat and Power System Program; allowing all rate classes to participate in the program; requiring an electric company to use a certain tariff structure to provide credits to owner-operators under the program; requiring a combined heat and power system to satisfy certain requirements and meet certain criteria; authorizing the export of excess generation from a system in a certain manner; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations by October 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page