Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season in Carroll County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0219
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM