Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Healey, Holmes, S. Robinson, Stein, Anderton, Barve, Cassilly, Flanagan, and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make specified determinations, review specified information, consider specified issues, and make specified recommendations related to the use of self-driving vehicles; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0778
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {830518/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {830518/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM