Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the School Board Nominating Commission of Anne Arundel County; requiring each member of the Commission to be a resident of Anne Arundel County; prohibiting, with a specified exception, a member of the Commission from being an employee of a county school board; altering the method of selecting and the term of the chair of the Commission; authorizing the reappointment of a member of the Commission; specifying the terms of specified members of the Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {495467/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174937/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174937/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174937/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174937/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {413620/1 Rejected (13-31)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {913422/1 Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Veto overridden (90-50)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Veto overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {495467/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/26/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {174937/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Astle) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {174937/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Reilly) Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {174937/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {174937/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {413620/1 Rejected (13-31) 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {913422/1 Rejected (15-31) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58A
Post Passage 4/06/2016 4/05/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Veto overridden (90-50) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Veto overridden (31-15) 62
Post Passage 4/09/2016 4/05/2016 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM