Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an archery hunter in Montgomery County use a tree stand when hunting any wild bird or mammal within a certain distance of certain buildings; and requiring that an archery hunter in Montgomery County be in an elevated position when hunting any wild bird or mammal within 50 to 100 yards of a dwelling house, residence, church, public or nonpublic school, or certain other buildings.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48C
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM