Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to require absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters as defined in the federal Uniformed and Overseas Citizens Absentee Voting Act and voters with a disability who do not have a Maryland driver's license or Maryland identification card and who use an online absentee ballot application or another Internet method to request an absentee ballot to provide the last four digits of the applicant's Social Security number, rather than the full Social Security number.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-305 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM