Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Frush, Lam, Lierman, S. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to issue a permit for roadside tree maintenance or removal only for public health and safety purposes or if the tree is dead or dying; prohibiting the Department from issuing a permit for roadside tree maintenance or removal for aesthetic purposes; requiring a person who removes a roadside tree to replace the roadside tree within 2 months after its removal; requiring the Department to ensure that all required replacement trees are planted; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-401, 5-401.1, 5-402, 5-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM