Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Korman, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Stewart, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Advisory Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Panel; requiring the Advisory Panel to review certain submissions and suggestions for a new State song and to hold at least three public hearings; requiring the Advisory Panel to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; terminating a certain provision of the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0128 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM