Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat Violations
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a penalty of $250 for a second or subsequent violation that occurs in the same county and within 60 days after the individual is found liable for a previous offense of overtaking and passing a school vehicle operating alternately flashing lights that are recorded by a school bus monitoring camera.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat Violations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat Violations
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-706.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM