Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,625,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for specified development or improvement purposes; providing for the disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM