Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Wicomico County to hunt deer on private property on the second Sunday in deer firearms season from 30 minutes before sunrise until 10:30 a.m.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {940016/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM