Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company Representative
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified limited liability company to have a company representative; requiring the articles of organization, articles of cancellation, and articles of reinstatement of a limited liability company to include the street address of its resident agent and the name and street address of the company representative; applying to a company representative provisions of law relating to a change of a resident agent, a change of address of a resident agent, or a resignation of a resident agent of a limited liability company; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4A-1002, 4A-101, 4A-204, 4A-210, 4A-909, 4A-916 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM