Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing a private lender to provide capital for a commercial loan provided under a local clean energy loan program; providing that, with the express consent of any holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on the property, a county or municipality may collect loan payments owed on a commercial loan to a private lender or to a county or municipality, and specified administrative costs, through a surcharge on a property owner's property tax bill; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0186
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1016 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713194/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {713194/1 Report Adopted 27
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 30
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Finance 29
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103, 1-1104, 1-1105 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM