Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, McHale, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to designate an arts, business, and cultural district in a specified area of Baltimore City; providing for the purpose of the arts, business, and cultural district; and authorizing specified tax credits for qualifying individuals located or working within the arts, business, and cultural district.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-901 through 4-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM