Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Beidle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making permanent a $50 fee for a certificate of title for a rental vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640917/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {829438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {640917/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {829438/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 54
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM