Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Buckel, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Davis, Fennell, Frick, Glenn, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a State correctional officer for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1101 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {873797/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM