Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Cullison, Bromwell, Hayes, Kelly, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale specified child care products or furniture containing specified flame-retardant chemicals; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of specified provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a specified determination; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM