Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, Chang, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Healey, Hill, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pendergrass, Proctor, Reznik, Rosenberg, Shetty, Stewart, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim of qualifying criminal activity or the victim's parent, guardian, or next friend to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification under certain circumstances; providing the certifying entity must certify or decline certification of the form within 90 days of receiving a certain request; providing that a certifying entity or official is immune from certain criminal or civil liability; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0144
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0581 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {602811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {803422/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-23)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-25)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {602811/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {803422/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (113-23) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {378173/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (115-25) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text - Chapter - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
(   11-930, 11-931 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page